Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10151168 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2018 | B2 | US2016326830 | 10.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2984282 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2018 | B1 | EP2984282 | 17.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP14716591 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105121777B | Global Dossier | 03.04.2018 | B | CN105121777 | 02.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014253098B | Global Dossier | 15.09.2016 | B2 | AU2014253098 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015024471 | 16.11.2021 | B1 | BR112015024471 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2908332 | 16.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2984282T | 02.01.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015013653 | 25.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2639344 | 21.12.2017 | C2 | RU2015145875 | 15.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA515361233 | 21.10.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP57369 | 11.04.2014 | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014167096 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2789792 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY176553 | 16.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13163519 | 12.04.2013 |