EP2789792 - A downhole expandable tubular [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welltec A/S Gydevang 25 3450 Allerød / DK | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hallundbæk, Jørgen Haregabsvej 15 Esbønderup Skovhuse 3230 Græsted / DK | 02 /
Stæhr, Lars Ørnebjergvej 44 2600 Glostrup / DK | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Dragsted Partners A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Hoffmann Dragsted A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 13163519.5 | 12.04.2013 | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2789792 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/10 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
E21B43/103 (EP,US);
E21B29/10 (RU);
E21B33/1208 (RU,US);
E21B33/1212 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erweiterbares Bohrlochrohr | [2014/42] | English: | A downhole expandable tubular | [2014/42] | French: | Élément tubulaire extensible de fond de trou | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 16.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006012530 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al); | [IY]WO2007021975 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) |