08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
18.09.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
11.10.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
07.10.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.06.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
12.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.06.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.09.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.07.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.01.2017 |
First examination report |
|
28.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.05.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
09.05.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
07.05.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.10.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |