Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8699251 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2014 | B2 | US2013278193 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454554 | 24.04.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2658069 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2019 | B1 | EP2658069 | 30.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213454554 | 24.04.2012 |