EP2800330 - Secret key management method for multi-network platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANIN INTERNATIONAL CO., LTD. 6F.-B2, No. 128-3, Sec. 2 Taichung Port Rd. Xitun Dist Taichung city 407 / TW | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsiao, Cheng-hao 3F. No. 173, Wenshan 3rd., St. Nantun Dist Taichung City 408 / TW | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13165775.1 | 29.04.2013 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800330 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H04L63/0815 (EP);
H04L63/168 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Geheimschlüsselverwaltungsverfahren für Mehrfachnetzwerkplattform | [2014/45] | English: | Secret key management method for multi-network platform | [2014/45] | French: | Procédé de gestion de clé secrète pour plateforme multi-réseau | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 07.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 11.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012011578 (HINTON HEATHER M [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0078]; figures 5,6 *; | [X]WO2011080389 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 17 * * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 9 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 4; figure 1 * * page 8, line 5 - line 25; figure 2 * |