EP2664791 - Wind turbine blade of variable geometry with passive control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Torres Martinez, Manuel C/ Sancho el Fuerte, 21 31007 Pamplona (Navarra) / ES | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13167746.0 | 14.05.2013 | [2013/47] | Priority number, date | ES20120000519 | 18.05.2012 Original published format: ES 201200519 | [2013/47] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2664791 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D1/06 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
F03D1/0641 (EP);
B64C21/08 (ES);
F03D1/0633 (ES);
F03D7/022 (EP);
F03D7/0232 (ES);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Windturbinenschaufel mit veränderlicher Geometrie mit passiver Steuerung | [2013/47] | English: | Wind turbine blade of variable geometry with passive control | [2013/47] | French: | Pale d'éolienne à géométrie variable avec un contrôle passif | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4692095 | US6361275 | WO2004099608 | ES2261100 | WO2008080407 | EP2282052 |