Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
27.03.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.02.2017 | Change - representative | |
28.10.2016 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
14.10.2016 | First examination report | |
13.06.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.06.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.07.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
14.01.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |