Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014009636 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20120074430 | 09.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140007529 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20120074430 | 09.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103546682 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20120074430 | 09.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2685708 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20120074430 | 09.07.2012 |