EP2685708 - Camera device and method for processing image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Haesun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Myoungwon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Jonghyub Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Chae, Yongsu Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Gover, Richard Paul Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13174841.0 | 03.07.2013 | [2014/03] | Priority number, date | KR20120074430 | 09.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120074430 | [2014/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2685708 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
H04N23/67 (EP,US);
G03B13/36 (KR,US);
H04N23/631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kameravorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bildverarbeitung | [2014/03] | English: | Camera device and method for processing image | [2014/03] | French: | Dispositif de caméra et procédé de traitement d'image | [2014/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007188652 (YUYAMA MASAMI [JP]) [I] 1-15* abstract *; | [I]US2008131019 (NG YI-REN [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2010141802 (KNIGHT TIMOTHY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [[0101]] , [ [0265]] - [[0269]]; figures 5A, 5D, 10A-10C, 12 *; | [X]US2012070097 (ADAMS JR JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2012069235 (IMAI FRANCISCO [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * |