20.05.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
24.01.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.08.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
24.07.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
11.05.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.11.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.11.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
07.11.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.06.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
09.05.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
09.05.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
18.04.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
18.04.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
18.04.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
17.04.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.04.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
22.10.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
16.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|