Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9079914 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2015 | B2 | US2012202804 | 09.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP60587 | 21.07.2010 | GB0912778 | 22.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5651692B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2015 | B2 | JP2012533603 | 27.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP60587 | 21.07.2010 | GB0912778 | 22.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2456774 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B1 | EP2456774 | 30.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP60587 | 21.07.2010 | GB0912778 | 22.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2653473 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0912778 | 22.07.2009 | EP10735280 | 21.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2433229T | 10.12.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP60587 | 21.07.2010 | GB0912778 | 22.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011009898 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0912778 | 22.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0912778D0 | 26.08.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0912778 | 22.07.2009 | Type | Earlier application | EP2456774 |