EP2653473 - Fused Aminodihydro-Oxazine Derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellard, John, Mark Eisai Limited European Knowledge Centre Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9SN / GB | 02 /
Farthing, Christopher, Neil Eisai Limited European Knowledge Centre Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9SN / GB | 03 /
Hall, Adrian Eisai Limited European Knowledge Centre Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9SN / GB | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Stansfield, Kevin Eisai Europe Limited Legal - IP Department European Knowledge Centre Mosquito Way Hatfield, Herts AL10 9SN / GB | [2013/43] | Application number, filing date | 13176232.0 | 21.07.2010 | [2013/43] | Priority number, date | GB20090012778 | 22.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0912778 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2653473 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, A61K31/5365, A61P25/28 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | 11.04.2014 | ME | 11.04.2014 | RS | 11.04.2014 | Title | German: | Kondensierte aminodihydrooxazinderivate | [2015/35] | English: | Fused Aminodihydro-Oxazine Derivatives | [2013/43] | French: | Dérivés d'aminodihydro-oxazine fusionnés | [2013/43] |
Former [2013/43] | Kondensierte aminodihydrooxazinderivate | Examination procedure | 11.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 11.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10735280.9 / EP2456774 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.07.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.07.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1942105 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * pages 1-5; example - * | by applicant | WO2007049532 | WO2008133273 | - BERGE; BIGHLEY; MONKHOUSE, J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 766, pages 1 - 19 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1992), vol. 57, pages 6972 - 6975 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., (1999), vol. 40, pages 8133 - 8136 | - TETRAHEDRON., (2005), vol. 61, pages 4128 - 4140 | - TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2005), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 528 - 539 | - ORG. LETT., (2004), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 277 - 279 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2005), vol. 61, no. 16, pages 4128 - 4140 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1982), vol. 47, pages 3597 - 3607 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 9, pages 2621 - 2629 | - T. W. GREEN; P. G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1991), pages 327 - 330 | - ROSOWSKY, A.; FORSCH, R. A.; MORAN, R. G.; FREISHEIM, J. H., J. MED. CHEM., (1991), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 227 - 234 | - BRZOSTWSKA, M.; BROSSI, A.; FLIPPEN-ANDERSON, J. L., HETEROCYCLES, (1991), vol. 32, no. 10, pages 1968 - 1972 | - ROMERO, D. L.; MORGE, R. A.; BILES, C.; BERRIOS-PENA, N.; MAY, P. D.; PALMER, J. R.; JOHNSON, P. D.; SMITH, H. W.; BUSSO, M.; TAN,, J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, no. 7, pages 998 - 1014 | - ORG. LETT., (2007), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 753 - 756 | - TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1994), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 1018 - 1028 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1998), vol. 54, no. 22, pages 5868 - 5882 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 5376 - 5383 | - BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1993), vol. 66, pages 2730 - 2737 | - SYNLETT., (2004), vol. 8, pages 1408 - 1413 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2003), vol. 68, pages 1207 - 1215 | - ORG. LETT., (2005), vol. 7, no. 25, pages 5741 - 5742 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1997), vol. 53, no. 16, pages 5752 - 5746 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, pages 2393 - 2407 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 5401 - 5402 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 15796 - 15806 | - ORGANIC PREPARATIONS AND PROCEDURES INTERNATIONAL, (1988), vol. 20, pages 73 - 82 | - T. W. GREEN; P. G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 506 - 507 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1998), vol. 63, pages 196 - 200 | - SYNTH. COMMUN., (2002), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 265 - 272 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2005), vol. 46, no. 45, pages 7751 - 7755 | - T. W. GREEN; P. G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 293 - 329 | - T. W. GREEN; P. G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 17 - 245 | - T. W. GREEN; P. G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 494 - 572 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 50, pages 5493 - 5508 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 3794 - 3804 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 3808 - 3812 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, pages 4538 - 4546 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 29, no. 41, pages 5312 - 5316 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1991), vol. 47, no. 26, pages 4591 - 4602 | - T. W. GREEN; P. G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 642 - 643 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2005), vol. 70, pages 2445 - 2454 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 7207 - 7213 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 4020 - 4028 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 5960 - 5967 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, pages 3093 - 3100 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 72, pages 8547 - 8550 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2008), vol. 73, pages 234 - 240 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 16900 - 16911 | - BUCHWALD, S. L. ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1999), vol. 121, no. 18, pages 4369 - 4378 | - T. W. GREEN; P. G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 531 - 537 | - ORG. LETT., (2007), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 558 - 562 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM, (2006), vol. 14, pages 4944 - 4957 | - ORG. LETT., (2007), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 761 - 764 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2007), vol. 48, pages 3525 - 3529 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2003), vol. 68, pages 4693 - 4699 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1996), vol. 61, page 3849 | - ORG. LETT., (2003), vol. 5, no. 23, pages 4397 - 4400 | - ORG. LETT., (2002), vol. 4, no. 4, page 581 | - ORG. PREP. PROCED. INT., (2007), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 399 - 402 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2005), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 2409 - 2413 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2005), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 719 - 723 | - JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS & RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (2003), vol. 46, no. 6, pages 555 - 566 |