Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8917497 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2014 | B2 | US2014021837 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213555834 | 23.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103569512B | Global Dossier | 28.12.2016 | B | CN103569512 | 12.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213555834 | 23.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2819827 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2016 | C | CA2819827 | 23.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213555834 | 23.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2690942 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2014 | A3 | EP2690942 | 29.01.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213555834 | 23.07.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX346297 | 14.03.2017 | B | MX2013008191 | 04.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213555834 | 23.07.2012 |