EP2690942 - Jobsite storage cabinet for housing electronic equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knaack LLC 420 East Terra Cotta Avenue Crystal Lake, IL 60014 / US | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergum, Robert A. 1605 Ash Ave. Woodstock, IL Illinois 60098 / US | 02 /
Peterson, Gary 10 Sandpiper Lane Hawthorn Woods, IL Illinois 60047 / US | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Smee, Anthony James Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13177647.8 | 23.07.2013 | [2014/05] | Priority number, date | US201213555834 | 23.07.2012 Original published format: US201213555834 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2690942 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2690942 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, H02B1/00, H04Q1/02 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
H05K7/1427 (EP,US);
H04Q1/025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/05] | H05K7/14, H02B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aufbewahrungsschrank am Arbeitsplatz zum Unterbringen von elektronischen Geräten | [2014/05] | English: | Jobsite storage cabinet for housing electronic equipment | [2014/05] | French: | Armoire de stockage de chantier pour équipement électronique | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6513342 (FLYNN THOMAS [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] * [I] 3,4,6-18; | [A]US6548753 (BLACKMON JR ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [A]US2007095774 (CANFIELD SHAWN M [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * | by applicant | US6772613 |