01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
27.09.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
19.10.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
17.10.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.10.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.10.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.06.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.06.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
01.06.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
17.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.04.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.04.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
13.04.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
29.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2017 |
Publication of search report |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
15.09.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
30.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |