EP2712784 - Bearing unit for railway vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Hideki c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13185592.6 | 23.09.2013 | [2014/14] | Priority number, date | JP20120215362 | 28.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012215362 | [2014/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712784 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B61F15/12 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
B61F15/12 (EP,US);
B60B35/18 (US);
B61F15/20 (EP,US);
B61K9/00 (EP,US);
F16C19/522 (EP,US);
F16C19/386 (EP,US);
F16C2326/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lagereinheit für Schienenfahrzeug | [2014/14] | English: | Bearing unit for railway vehicle | [2014/14] | French: | Unité de roulement pour véhicule ferroviaire | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 20.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0831331 (SKF IND SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 3; | [AD]WO0051869 (SKF IND SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1 * page 6, paragraph 5; figure - *; | [XI]US6161962 (FRENCH MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 6; figure - * [I] 3; | [XI]US2002092360 (MCDEARMON GRAHAM F [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2,3; | [D]JP2002542973 ; | [A]JP2006057813 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO2009121879 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | JP2002542973 |