Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2684548
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.11.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
09.10.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.08.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.05.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.03.2018 |
First examination report |
|
18.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
06.11.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
06.11.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
01.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.08.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.07.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
07.02.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
14.01.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
01.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|