Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9849040 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2015075711 | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213477131 | 22.05.2012 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | US201414549573 | 21.11.2014 | US53428609 | 03.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8919407 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2014 | B2 | US2012325408 | 27.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213477131 | 22.05.2012 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | US53428609 | 03.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8206533 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2012 | B2 | US2010051166 | 04.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | US53428609 | 03.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10555840 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2020 | B2 | US2018078426 | 22.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213477131 | 22.05.2012 | US201715822569 | 27.11.2017 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | US201414549573 | 21.11.2014 | US53428609 | 03.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5179666B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2013 | B2 | JP2012500669 | 12.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2317963 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2021 | B1 | EP2317963 | 11.05.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009288466 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2684548 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09791821 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0917994 | 21.09.2021 | B1 | BRPI0917994 | 17.02.2021 | A8 | BRPI0917994 | 02.02.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2735532 | 10.12.2013 | C | CA2735532 | 11.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102137647B | 16.07.2014 | B | CN102137647 | 27.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011001979 | 05.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2317963T | 31.01.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | EP09791821 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2479297 | 20.04.2013 | C2 | RU2011103969 | 10.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201100806 | 30.07.2014 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009US54714 | 24.08.2009 | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010027719 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2010 | A3 | WO2010027719 | 11.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013078647 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR074179 | 29.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2011000417 | 05.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9179908 | 26.08.2008 | Type | Earlier application | EP2317963 |