EP2684548 - Method and apparatus for making disposable absorbent article with absorbent particulate polymer material and article made therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hundorf, Harald Hermann KOENIGSTRASSE 78 53115 Bonn / DE | 02 /
Sanz, Miguel Brandt Procter & Gamble GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach / DE | 03 /
Beruda, Holger BERLINERSTRASSE 65 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 04 /
Blessing, Horst 3563 Mooney Avenue Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45208 / US | 05 /
Dziezok, Peter Auf der Schlicht 56 65239 Hochheim / DE | 06 /
Krause, Axel REINOLDWEG 13 50374 Erftstadt / DE | 07 /
Schmidt, Mattias Sulzbacher Str. 40 - 50 65824 Schwalbach / DE | 08 /
Stelzig, Lutz BATTENBERGERWEG 33 60489 Frankfurt / DE | [2014/11] |
Former [2014/03] | 01 /
Hundorf, Harald Hermann KOENIGSTRASSE 78 53115 Bonn / DE | ||
02 /
Sanz, Miguel Brandt Procter & Gamble GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach / DE | |||
03 /
Beruda, Holger BERLINERSTRASSE 65 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | |||
04 /
Blessing, Horst 1007 Paradrome Street Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45202 / US | |||
05 /
Dziezok, Peter Auf der Schlicht 56 65239 Hochheim / DE | |||
06 /
Krause, Axel REINOLDWEG 13 50374 Erftstadt / DE | |||
07 /
Schmidt, Mattias Sulzbacher Str. 40 - 50 65824 Schwalbach / DE | |||
08 /
Stelzig, Lutz BATTENBERGERWEG 33 60489 Frankfurt / DE | Representative(s) | Mather, Peter Geoffrey NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2014/03] | Application number, filing date | 13185906.8 | 24.08.2009 | [2014/03] | Priority number, date | US20080091799P | 26.08.2008 Original published format: US 91799 P | [2014/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2684548 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/532, A61F13/53, // A61F13/539, A61F13/535 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
A61F13/5323 (EP,US);
A61F13/15634 (US);
A61F13/15658 (EP,US);
A61F13/15699 (US);
B05C19/00 (US);
B32B37/1207 (US);
B32B37/1284 (US);
B32B37/24 (US);
B32B38/1858 (US);
B32B5/30 (US);
A61F2013/530496 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530554 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530562 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53908 (US);
A61F2013/53958 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines saugfähigen Artikels mit partikelförmigem saugfähigem Polymermaterial und damit hergestellter Artikel | [2014/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for making disposable absorbent article with absorbent particulate polymer material and article made therewith | [2014/03] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour fabriquer un article absorbant jetable avec matériau polymère particulaire absorbant et article fabriqué à partir de celui-ci | [2014/03] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 31.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09791821.3 / EP2317963 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090791821) is 23.11.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.11.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007014235 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10* figures 1-3; page 14 last two paragraphs to page 16 first two paragraphs *; | [E]EP2157951 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1-10 * figures 1, 2, 3, 5, 6, 7B, 8, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14; pages 1-2; page 14, lines 11-22; page 15, line 4; page 15, line 7 - page 16, line 2; page 21, line 2 from below - page 24, line 6 *; | [E]EP2273959 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1-10 * figures 1, 2, 3, 5-10, 16-20; page 19, lines 3-8; page 40, line 22 - page 43, line 22 * | by applicant | US3860003 | EP0149880 | US4610678 | US4834735 | US4888231 | US4940464 | US5037416 | US5092861 | US5137537 | US5151092 | US5246433 | US5260345 | US5269775 | US5387207 | US5397316 | WO9516746 | US5554145 | US5569234 | US5571096 | US5625222 | US5897545 | US5957908 | US6004306 | US6120487 | US6120489 | WO02064877 | US2003105190 | US2003148684 | US6645569 | US2003233082 | US2004158212 | US2005008839 | US6863933 | US2005159720 | WO2006062258 | US7112621 | US2007118087 |