17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
27.07.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
18.08.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.08.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
22.08.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
25.02.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |