Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2846933
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.07.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
06.07.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.04.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.12.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.09.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2016 |
First examination report |
|
03.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.07.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
02.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
13.02.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
21.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
15.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|