Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015132590 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP59496 | 07.05.2013 | EP12166997 | 07.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2846933 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP59496 | 07.05.2013 | EP12166997 | 07.05.2012 | EP13724542 | 07.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013167596 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12166997 | 07.05.2012 |