EP2846933 - ACTIVE CORROSION PROTECTION COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vrije Universiteit Brussel Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles Avenue Franklin Roosevelt, 50 CP 161 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Vrije Universiteit Brussel Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | ||
For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 50 CP 161 1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE GRAEVE, Iris VRIJE UNIVERSITEIT BRUSSEL Pleinlaan 2 B-1050 Brussels / BE | 02 /
TERRYN, Herman VRIJE UNIVERSITEIT BRUSSEL Pleinlaan 2 B-1050 Brussels / BE | 03 /
RENIERS, François Clos des Chênes 5 B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | 04 /
DE VOS, Caroline Lauwersstraat 36 B-1560 Hoeilaart / BE | 05 /
KAKAROGLOU, Alexandros Pleinlaan 2 B-1050 Brussels / BE | 06 /
NISOL, Bernard Avenue Franklin Roosenvelt 50 CP161 B-1050 Brussels / BE | 07 /
VAN MELE, Bruno Pleinlaan 2 B-1050 Brussels / BE | 08 /
VAN ASSCHE, Guy PLeinlaan 2 B-1050 Brussels / BE | 09 /
SCHELTJENS, Gill Pleinlaan 2 B-1050 Brussels / BE | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 13724542.9 | 07.05.2013 | WO2013EP59496 | Priority number, date | EP20120166997 | 07.05.2012 Original published format: EP 12166997 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013167596 | Date: | 14.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2846933 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/14, C09D5/08, B05D1/00 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
B05D7/14 (EP,US);
C23F11/02 (US);
B05D1/62 (EP,US);
C23F13/005 (US);
C23F13/02 (US);
B05D2202/25 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | AKTIVE KORROSIONSSCHUTZBESCHICHTUNGEN | [2015/12] | English: | ACTIVE CORROSION PROTECTION COATINGS | [2015/12] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS DE PROTECTION ANTICORROSION EFFICACES | [2015/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 14.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19824364 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,7,8,14,23 *; | [XYI]US2003148139 (MOSER EVA MARIA [CH]) [X] 12,14 * figure - * [Y] 8 [I] 1,2; | [A]WO2005028125 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 14, line 3 - line 7 * * page 15, line 20 - page 17, line 12 * * figure 1; claims 19,20,21 *; | [A]WO2005089960 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,3,16 *; | [YA]WO2012007388 (SOLVAY [BE], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0081]; figure -; claim 1 *[A] 1 |