EP2872539 - INCREASED POLYMER MELT FLOW RATIO VIA FEED OF A SUPPORTED CATALYST SATURATED WITH A SELECTED LIQUID AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies, LLC 5555 San Felipe Suite 1950 Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSSEIN, F., David 5403 Bennett Drive Cross Lanes, WV 25313 / US | 02 /
ZILKER, Daniel, P. 1336 Johnson Road Charleston, WV 25314 / US | 03 /
CANN, Kevin, J. 31 Montgomery Avenue Rocky Hill, NJ 05883 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/50] |
Former [2015/21] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13734881.9 | 14.06.2013 | [2020/50] | WO2013US45938 | Priority number, date | US201261671525P | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671525 P | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011357 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872539 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2872539 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F4/6592, C08F4/659 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,RU,US);
C08F4/65916 (RU,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,RU,US);
C08F4/65925 (EP,RU,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65916 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2015/21] | C08F210/02, C08F2/34, C08F4/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERHÖHTE POLYMERSCHMELZFLUSSRATIO ÜBER ZUFÜHRUNG EINES MIT EINEM AUSGEWÄHLTEN FLÜSSIGMITTEL GESÄTTIGTEN GETRÄGERTEN KATALYSATORS | [2015/21] | English: | INCREASED POLYMER MELT FLOW RATIO VIA FEED OF A SUPPORTED CATALYST SATURATED WITH A SELECTED LIQUID AGENT | [2015/21] | French: | INDICE DE FLUAGE DE POLYMÈRE AUGMENTÉ PAR ALIMENTATION D'UN CATALYSEUR SUPPORTÉ SATURÉ AVEC UN AGENT LIQUIDE SÉLECTIONNÉ | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 17.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2013 | AL | 09.12.2020 | AT | 09.12.2020 | CY | 09.12.2020 | CZ | 09.12.2020 | DK | 09.12.2020 | EE | 09.12.2020 | FI | 09.12.2020 | HR | 09.12.2020 | LT | 09.12.2020 | LV | 09.12.2020 | MC | 09.12.2020 | MK | 09.12.2020 | MT | 09.12.2020 | PL | 09.12.2020 | RO | 09.12.2020 | RS | 09.12.2020 | SE | 09.12.2020 | SI | 09.12.2020 | SK | 09.12.2020 | SM | 09.12.2020 | BG | 09.03.2021 | NO | 09.03.2021 | GR | 10.03.2021 | IS | 09.04.2021 | PT | 09.04.2021 | IE | 14.06.2021 | LU | 14.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.06.2013 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
MK | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 14.06.2013 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 14.06.2013 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
IE | 14.06.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 14.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SE | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 09.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1234837 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-22* paragraphs [0021] , [0033] , [0041] , [0042]; examples 1-4; claims 1-31; table 1 * | Examination | WO2012074709 | WO2013026131 | WO2013028283 |