30.03.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
08.03.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.12.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.06.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.06.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
09.06.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
01.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
30.03.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.03.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
30.03.2016 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
26.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.05.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
15.05.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
15.05.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
27.03.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
17.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
14.11.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
31.10.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
31.10.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
16.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|