Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9269489 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2016 | B2 | US2013207601 | 15.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | US201313748269 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9761370 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B2 | US2013207468 | 15.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313748187 | 23.01.2013 | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9123467 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2015 | B2 | US2013188397 | 25.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | US201313748074 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140117596 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22788 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6114310B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B2 | JP2015511479 | 16.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22788 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015510749 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22787 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2807663 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2015 | A4 | EP2807663 | 03.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22787 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104205264B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2016 | B | CN104205264 | 10.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22788 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104205263 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22787 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2807662 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2015 | A4 | EP2807662 | 03.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22788 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014018151 | 11.07.2017 | A8 | BR112014018151 | 20.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22788 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX338023 | 31.03.2016 | B | MX2014008894 | 09.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | WO2013US22788 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013112614 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013112613 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013112609 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261589599 | 23.01.2012 |