EP2807662 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Utah State University 1780 North Research Park Way Suite 108 North Logan, Utah 84341 / US | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Hunter 134 South 400 East, Apt. 323 Salt Lake City Utah 84111 / US | 02 /
SEALY, Kylee 10 North Sherwood Drive Providence Utah 84332 / US | 03 /
GILCHRIST, Aaron 2448 South 1240 West Nibley, Utah 84321 / US | [2015/01] |
Former [2014/51] | 01 /
WU, Hunter 134 South 400 East, Apt. 323 Salt Lake City Utah 84111 / US | ||
02 /
SEALY, Kylee 10 North Sherwood Drive Providence Utah 84332 / US | |||
03 /
GILCHRIST, Aaron 1174 East 1900 North Logan, Utah 84341 / US | |||
Former [2014/49] | 01 /
WU, Hunter 700 North 1200 East Bullen Hall Room 209 Logan, Utah 84322 / US | ||
02 /
SEALY, Kylee 646 South 600 East Logan, Utah 84321 / US | |||
03 /
GILCHRIST, Aaron 1174 East 1900 North Logan, Utah 84341 / US | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13740565.0 | 23.01.2013 | WO2013US22788 | Priority number, date | US201261589599P | 23.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261589599 P | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013112614 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807662 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 01.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/14, H02J7/02, H02J5/00 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
B60L53/122 (EP,US);
B60L53/12 (KR);
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
H01F38/14 (KR,US);
H02J50/10 (US);
H02J50/12 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00712 (EP,KR,US);
H02M7/53871 (EP,KR,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
H02J50/90 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/25] | H01F38/14, H02J7/02, H02J5/00, H02J17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/49] | H01F38/14, H02J7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2014/49] | English: | WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM | [2014/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 23.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011080056 (LOW ZHEN NING [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0124]; figure 6 *; | [Y] - HUNTER HANZHUO WU ET AL, "Design of Symmetric Voltage Cancellation Control for LCL converters in Inductive Power Transfer Systems", ELECTRIC MACHINES&DRIVES CONFERENCE (IEMDC), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20110515), doi:10.1109/IEMDC.2011.5994928, ISBN 978-1-4577-0060-6, pages 866 - 871, XP032038751 [Y] 1-15 * page 866 - page 867; figures 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMDC.2011.5994928 | [Y] - HUNTER H. WU ET AL, "A 1kW inductive charging system using AC processing pickups", 2011 6TH IEEE CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS, (20110601), doi:10.1109/ICIEA.2011.5975920, ISBN 978-1-42-448754-7, pages 1999 - 2004, XP055188286 [Y] 1-3,5-7,9,10,12,15 * page 1999; figure 1 * * page 2003; figure 12 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIEA.2011.5975920 | [Y] - BOYS J T ET AL, "Stability and control of inductively coupled power transfer systems", IEE PROCEEDINGS: ELECTRIC POWER APPLICATIONS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, GB, (20000111), vol. 147, no. 1, doi:10.1049/IP-EPA:20000017, ISSN 1350-2352, pages 37 - 43, XP006014100 [Y] 4,13,14 * page 37 - page 40; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-epa:20000017 | [Y] - HUNTER HANZHUO WU ET AL, "A review on inductive charging for electric vehicles", ELECTRIC MACHINES&DRIVES CONFERENCE (IEMDC), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, (20110515), doi:10.1109/IEMDC.2011.5994820, ISBN 978-1-4577-0060-6, pages 143 - 147, XP032038644 [Y] 8,11 * page 143 - page 144; figures 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMDC.2011.5994820 | International search | [A]US6317338 (BOYS JOHN TALBOT [NZ]); | [A]US6366051 (NANTZ JOHN S [US], et al); | [A]RU2412514 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2011049978 (SASAKI MASARU [JP], et al); | [X]US2011163542 (FARKAS LASZLO [US]); | [A]WO2012001291 (RENAULT SA [FR], et al) |