Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014342626 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012017209 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013JP51815 | 29.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101625778B | Global Dossier | 30.05.2016 | B1 | KR20140108248 | 05.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012017209 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013JP51815 | 29.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104093479B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2016 | B | CN104093479 | 08.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012017209 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013JP51815 | 29.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2810702 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B1 | EP2810702 | 02.09.2015 | A4 | EP2810702 | 10.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012017209 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013JP51815 | 29.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2632433T | 13.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2012017209 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013JP51815 | 29.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013115149 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012017209 | 30.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013154304 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2013 | A | JP5216924B | 19.06.2013 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012017209 | 30.01.2012 |