EP2813401 - PRETENSIONER MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho 260 Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAGAWA, Wataru c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO 260 Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 02 /
UKITA, Masaru c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO 260 Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 03 /
YAMAZOE, Hiroaki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO 260 Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 13747097.7 | 06.02.2013 | [2017/36] | WO2013JP52757 | Priority number, date | JP20120027504 | 10.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012027504 | [2014/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013118780 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2813401 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2813401 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/46 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
B60R22/4633 (EP,KR,US);
B60R22/46 (KR);
B60R22/4604 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORSPANNMECHANISMUS | [2014/51] | English: | PRETENSIONER MECHANISM | [2014/51] | French: | MÉCANISME DE PRÉTENDEUR | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2014 | Translation filed | 02.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 15.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2013 | AL | 06.09.2017 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | IE | 06.02.2018 | LU | 06.02.2018 | MT | 06.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
MT | 06.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 06.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
LU | 06.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2012006927 (NAGATA TOMONORI [JP], et al) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0074]; figure 2 * [A] 1-8; | [A]US6318662 (HORI SEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 42 - column 15, line 35; figures 1-5 * | International search | [X]JP2001151077 (TAKATA CORP); | [X]JP2003535751 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LABORATORY, INC.); | [A]JP2000313311 (ASHIMORI IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008285136 |