EP2892556 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfacyte Ltd Biocity Scotland Bo'ness Road Newhouse Lanarkshire ML1 5UH / GB | [2017/10] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Alfacyte Ltd 7 Lawn Park Milngavie Glasgow G62 6HG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIMSON, William 7 Lawn Park Milngavie Glasgow G62 6HG / GB | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2015/29] | Kiernan, Lisa Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13763273.3 | 04.09.2013 | [2019/20] | WO2013GB52316 | Priority number, date | GB20120015873 | 05.09.2012 Original published format: GB 201215873 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014037717 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2892556 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2892556 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/35, A61K39/39, A61K38/21, A61P37/02, A61P37/08 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A61K38/212 (EP,US);
A61K39/35 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61K2039/542 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DER BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN | [2015/29] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES | [2015/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 01.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2016/26] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2018 | 08.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2013 | AL | 15.05.2019 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | LU | 04.09.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.09.2013 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.09.2013 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
LU | 04.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | LT | 15.05.2019 | |
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 15.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9524212 (IMPERIAL COLLEGE [GB], et al) [X] 1,12,16,26,30,40 * page 3, line 18 - line 21 * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 13; figure 1; claims 1-3, 7 *; | [XI]US6350589 (MORRIS JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12,16-18,25,26,30-32,39,40 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * [I] 4-6,15,19-21,29,33-35,43; | [A]WO2005123112 (TOVEY MICHAEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-6,11,12,15-21,25,26,29-35,39,40,43* paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0011] - [0021] - [0029] - [0036] - [0038] , [0041] - [0046]; examples 1-3; claims 1-16 *; | [XI] - SOUILLET G ET AL, "Alpha-interferon treatment of patient with hyper IgE syndrome.", LANCET, (19890617), vol. 333, no. 8651, ISSN 0140-6736, page 1384, XP002715899 [X] 1,2,5,12,16,17,20,26,30,31,34,40 * the whole document * [I] 6,11,15,21,25,29,35,39,43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(89)92823-7 | [XI] - TILG HERBERT, "New insights into the mechanisms of interferon alfa: An immunoregulatory and anti-inflammatory cytokine", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1997), vol. 112, no. 3, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 1017 - 1021, XP002715900 [X] 1-5,12,16-20,26,30-34,40 * the whole document, especially page 1017-page 1018, bridging paragraph * [I] 6,11,15,21,25,29,35,39,43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/gast.1997.v112.pm9041265 | Examination | US6436391 | WO02095067 | WO2006111745 | - IMD Berlin-Potsdam, "T-Helferzellstatus TH1/TH2/TH17/Treg-Profil", no. Diagnostikinformation 238, URL: http://www.imd-berlin.de/fileadmin/user_upload/Diag_Info/238_TH1217_Profil.pdf, (20160425), XP002756974 |