EP2932212 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTACTLESS MEASUREMENT OF THE TEMPERATURE OF A MOVING BODY WITH UNKNOWN EMISSIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/43] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTACTLESSLY DETERMINING THE TEMPERATURE OF A MOVING OBJECT HAVING AN UNKNOWN DEGREE OF EMISSION | ||
[2016/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, TR | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIKORA AG Bruchweide 2 28307 Bremen / DE | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIKORA, Harald Katrepeler Landstrasse 70 A 28357 Bremen / DE | 02 /
PARGA GARCIA, Abraham Im Hollergrund 22 28357 Bremen / DE | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 79-87 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13814490.2 | 13.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013EP76553 | Priority number, date | DE20121024418 | 14.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012024418 | [2015/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014090994 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2932212 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2932212 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/00, G01J5/08 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
G01J5/0022 (EP,RU,US);
G01J5/0096 (EP,US);
G01J5/0887 (EP,US);
G01J5/0896 (EP,US);
G01J5/802 (EP,RU,US);
G01J2005/0077 (RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BERÜHRUNGSLOSEN BESTIMMEN DER TEMPERATUR EINES BEWEGTEN GEGENSTANDS MIT UNBEKANNTEM EMISSIONSGRAD | [2015/43] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTACTLESS MEASUREMENT OF THE TEMPERATURE OF A MOVING BODY WITH UNKNOWN EMISSIVITY | [2016/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR MESURER SANS CONTACT ET INDÉPENDEMMENT DU POUVOIR ÉMISSIF LA TEMPÉRATURE D'UN CORPS MOBILE | [2016/18] |
Former [2015/43] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTACTLESSLY DETERMINING THE TEMPERATURE OF A MOVING OBJECT HAVING AN UNKNOWN DEGREE OF EMISSION | ||
Former [2015/43] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER SANS CONTACT LA TEMPÉRATURE D'UN OBJET EN MOUVEMENT À DEGRÉ D'ÉMISSION INCONNU | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2013 | AL | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | MT | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | IE | 13.12.2016 | LU | 13.12.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 13.12.2013 | |
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.12.2013 | |
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 13.12.2016 | ||
LU | 13.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE2150963 (PHILIPS NV) [X] 1-3,5,7,11,12,17-20,22,24,28,29,34 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * [Y] 13,30 [I] 4,21; | [XY]US4316088 (CORBIER ROBERT, et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 11; figures 1,13 * [Y] 13,30; | [I]US3884075 (BRAENDLI GEROLD DR [CH], et al) [I] 1,6,23 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE202004004402U (HEITRONICS INFRAROT MESSTECHNI [DE]) [A] 6,23 * paragraphs [0002] , [0028] - [0031]; figures 1,4 *; | [YA]US4015476 (ROCHE JOHN J, et al) [Y] 13,30 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 62; figures 1,2 * [A] 8-10,25-27; | [A]CN102795627 (HEFEI RUISHI MEASUREMENT & CONTROL ENGINEERING TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 13,30 * abstract * |