|
04.10.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
29.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Translation of the annexes to the International Preliminary Examination Report |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Deficiencies in translation of international application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
03.04.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
03.04.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2014 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
75 |