17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
05.10.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
27.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
27.10.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
25.10.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.10.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
22.08.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
22.08.2017 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.04.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.02.2016 |
First examination report |
|
05.02.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.11.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
01.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2015 |
Change - inventor |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
24.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
24.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
24.07.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
12.06.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
12.06.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
16.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
09.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|