Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9687793 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | B2 | US2015224452 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012197927 | 07.09.2012 | JP2013084400 | 12.04.2013 | WO2013JP74141 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10046283 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2018 | B2 | US2017282130 | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012197927 | 07.09.2012 | JP2013084400 | 12.04.2013 | US201514426508 | 06.03.2015 | WO2013JP74141 | 06.09.2013 | US201715599841 | 19.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102140938B | Global Dossier | 04.08.2020 | B1 | KR20150052848 | 14.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012197927 | 07.09.2012 | JP2013084400 | 12.04.2013 | WO2013JP74141 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6104916B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B2 | JPWO2014038674 | 12.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012197927 | 07.09.2012 | JP2013084400 | 12.04.2013 | WO2013JP74141 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104619747B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B | CN104619747 | 13.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012197927 | 07.09.2012 | JP2013084400 | 12.04.2013 | WO2013JP74141 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2894185 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2017 | B1 | EP2894185 | 26.08.2015 | A4 | EP2894185 | 15.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012197927 | 07.09.2012 | JP2013084400 | 12.04.2013 | WO2013JP74141 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN1861DELNP2015 | 31.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012197927 | 07.09.2012 | JP2013084400 | 12.04.2013 | WO2013JP74141 | 06.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014038674 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012197927 | 07.09.2012 | JP2013084400 | 12.04.2013 |