17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
15.06.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
07.07.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.06.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.11.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.05.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
06.05.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
06.05.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
07.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
08.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] |
19.06.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
19.06.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
16.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
09.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|