Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9780898 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2015244486 | 27.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210345480 | 17.09.2012 | WO2013CN70326 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2897399 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2017 | B1 | EP2897399 | 08.06.2016 | A4 | EP2897399 | 22.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210345480 | 17.09.2012 | WO2013CN70326 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014040398 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210345480 | 17.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103686756B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2016 | B | CN103686756 | 26.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210345480 | 17.09.2012 |