EP2901343 - METHOD FOR DEPICTING PLUME ARRIVAL TIMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America as represented by the Secretary of the Navy Naval Research Laboratory 4555 Overlook Avenue, S.W. Code 1008.2 Washington, DC 20375 / US | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATNAIK, Gopal 12904 Hawkshead Terrace Silver Spring, MD 20904 / US | 02 /
OBENSCHAIN, Keith, S. 9531 Burdett Road Burke, VA 22015 / US | 03 /
MOSES, Adam, J. 7715 Inversham Drive 112 Falls Church, VA / US | 04 /
BORIS, Jay P. 3516 Duff Drive Falls Church, Virginia 22041 / US | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Raynor, Simon Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 13842952.7 | 20.09.2013 | WO2013US60829 | Priority number, date | US201213629842 | 28.09.2012 Original published format: US201213629842 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014052180 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2901343 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06F3/048, G06F3/14 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
G01N33/0075 (EP,US);
G06F7/60 (US);
G01N21/94 (US);
G01N33/00 (US);
G01W1/10 (EP,US);
G01N2015/019 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON GASWOLKENANKUNFTSZEITEN | [2015/32] | English: | METHOD FOR DEPICTING PLUME ARRIVAL TIMES | [2015/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REPRÉSENTATION DE L'HEURE D'ARRIVÉE DE PANACHES | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 03.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 27.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2015 | 30.09.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2007038383 (BORIS JAY P [US], et al) [XD] 1-8 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0043] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0082]; figure 12 *; | [A] - THEODORE YOUNG ET AL, "Emergency Assessment with Sensors and Buildings: Advances in CT-Analyst Technology", INTERNET CITATION, (20041019), pages 1 - 19, URL: http://www.lcp.nrl.navy.mil/ct-analyst/Technical_Documents_files/Williamsburg_04.pdf, (20120427), XP002674908 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * | [A] - JAWARD M H ET AL, "Sequential Monte Carlo methods for contour tracking of contaminant clouds", SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 90, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.SIGPRO.2009.06.022, ISSN 0165-1684, (20100101), pages 249 - 260, (20090627), XP026545049 [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0004]; figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sigpro.2009.06.022 | International search | [A]US2009018780 (SOOKHU YOGANAND JOHN [US]); | [A]KR100920821B (ANYTRON CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2010030475 (SOHL III JOHN H [US], et al); | [A]KR20110077040 (UNIV KONKUK IND COOP CORP [KR]); | [A]US2012150353 (BASSA NIR [IL]) |