03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
13.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
12.04.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
15.05.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
11.05.2018 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.04.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.12.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
05.12.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
27.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
12.10.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
15.06.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.05.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
23.05.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.04.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
14.04.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
14.04.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
09.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2016 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
07.10.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
07.10.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
26.02.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
05.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
25.09.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] |
23.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.07.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
21.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2015 |
New entry: Biological material |
|
22.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|