Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9862974 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | B2 | US2016053284 | 25.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US77364 | 23.12.2013 | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | US201361835294 | 14.06.2013 | US201314654827 | 23.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9315832 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2016 | B2 | US2015017704 | 15.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | US201314041122 | 30.09.2013 | US201414297294 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8846369 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2014 | B2 | US2014178973 | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | US201314041122 | 30.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9157101 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2015 | B2 | US2014178958 | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | US201314138123 | 22.12.2013 | US201361835294 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3415614 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US77364 | 23.12.2013 | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | EP13864074 | 23.12.2013 | US201361835294 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104903438 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US77364 | 23.12.2013 | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | US201361835294 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2935566 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B1 | EP2935566 | 09.11.2016 | A4 | EP2935566 | 28.10.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US77364 | 23.12.2013 | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | US201361835294 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015007645 | 03.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US77364 | 23.12.2013 | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | US201361835294 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014100799 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2014 | A3 | WO2014100799 | 26.06.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261741000 | 21.12.2012 | US201361835294 | 14.06.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3415614 |