EP2935566 - CYANOBACTERIUM SP. FOR PRODUCTION OF COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/44] | CYANOBACTERIUM SP.FOR PRODUCTION OF COMPOUNDS | ||
[2017/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Algenol Biofuels, Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Kui Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 02 /
SHI, Tuo Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 03 /
PIVEN, Irina Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 04 /
INABA, Masami Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 05 /
ULICZKA, Frank Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 06 /
KRAMER, Dan Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 07 /
ENKE, Heike Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 08 /
BAIER, Kerstin Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 09 /
FRIEDRICH, Alexandra Algenol BiofuelsInc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 10 /
DUEHRING, Ulf Algenol Biofuels Inc. 16121 Lee Road Suite 110 Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 13864074.3 | 23.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013US77364 | Priority number, date | US201261741000P | 21.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261741000 P | US201361835294P | 14.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361835294 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014100799 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2935566 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2935566 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12N9/04, C12N9/88, C07K14/195, C12N15/52, C12N15/74, C12P7/06, // C12R1/01 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
C12P7/065 (EP,US);
C12P7/06 (US);
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/74 (EP,US);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C12R2001/01 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | C12N1/21, C12N15/63 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CYANOBACTERIUM SP. ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN | [2015/44] | English: | CYANOBACTERIUM SP. FOR PRODUCTION OF COMPOUNDS | [2017/20] | French: | CYANOBACTERIUM SP. POUR LA PRODUCTION DE COMPOSÉS | [2015/44] |
Former [2015/44] | CYANOBACTERIUM SP.FOR PRODUCTION OF COMPOUNDS | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 13.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18171166.4 / EP3415614 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2013 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | PT | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | GB | 23.12.2018 | IE | 23.12.2018 | LU | 23.12.2018 | MT | 23.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 23.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 23.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 23.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
MT | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 23.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
GB | 23.12.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 23.12.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9839457 (ENOL ENERGY INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007084477 (UNIV HAWAII [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010068776 (WOODS R PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010297736 (DUHRING ULF [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012142066 (BAIER KERSTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2012175750 (ALGENOL BIOFUELS INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2013098265 (ALGENOL BIOFUELS INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A] - GAO Z. ET AL, "Photosynthetic production of ethanol from carbon dioxide in genetically engineered cyanobacteria", ENERGY & ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, (20120926), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1039/c2ee22675h, ISSN 1754-5692, page 9857, XP055120138 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C2EE22675H | [A] - DEXTER J. ET AL, "Metabolic engineering of cyanobacteria for ethanol production", ENERGY & ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, (20090610), vol. 2, doi:10.1039/B811937F, ISSN 1754-5692, pages 857 - 864, XP002579653 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B811937F | [A] - DENG M.-D. ET AL, "Ethanol synthesis by genetic engineering in cyanobacteria", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (19990201), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 523 - 528, XP003016237 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - RUFFING A.M., "Engineered cyanobacteria: Teaching an old bug new tricks", BIOENGINEERED BUGS, (20110501), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.4161/bbug.2.3.15285, ISSN 1949-1018, pages 136 - 149, XP055037901 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/bbug.2.3.15285 | [A] - WANG B. ET AL, "Application of synthetic biology in cyanobacteria and algae", FRONTIERS IN MICROBIOLOGY, (20120919), vol. 3, doi:10.3389/fmicb.2012.00344, XP055062294 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fmicb.2012.00344 | [AD] - XU YU ET AL, "Expression of Genes in Cyanobacteria: Adaptation of Endogenous Plasmids as Platforms for High-Level Gene Expression in Synechococcus sp. PCC 7002", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2011), Database accession no. PREV201100170403, XP002762117 [AD] 1-13 * abstract * | [ ] - PHOTOSYNTHESIS RESEARCH PROTOCOLS, SECOND EDITION HUMANA PRESS INC, 999 RIVERVIEW DR, STE 208, TOTOWA, NJ 07512-1165 USA SERIES : METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY (ISSN 1064-3745(PRINT)), (2011), doi:10.1007/978.1.60761.925.3_21, ISSN null, pages 273 - 293 | International search | [A]WO2008106803 (NVENTA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2010068776 (WOODS R PAUL [US], et al); | [X]US2010297736 (DUHRING ULF [DE], et al); | [A]US2012142066 (BAIER KERSTIN [DE], et al); | [Y] - KONGSUWAN, K ET AL., "The Plasmid RK2 Replication Initiator Protein (TrfA) Binds To The Sliding Clamp Beta Subunit Of DNA Polymerase III: Implication For The Toxicity Of A Peptide Derived From The Amino-Terminal Portion Of 33-Kilodalton TrfA.", JOUMAL OF BACTERIOLOGY., (200608), vol. 188, no. 15, pages 5501 - 5509, XP055260534 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.00231-06 | [Y] - HELMAN, Y ET AL., "Genes Encoding A-Type Flavoproteins Are Essential For Photoreduction Of 02 In Cyanobacteria.", CURRENT BIOLOGY., (20030204), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 230 - 235, XP055260535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(03)00046-0 | [Y] - WILDE, A ET AL., "Characterization Of The Cyanobacterial ycf37: Mutation Decreases The Photosystem I Content.", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (20010701), vol. 357, no. 1, pages 211 - 216, XP055260536 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj3570211 | [Y] - BASS, K ET AL., "Isolation And Characterization Of cLV25, A Bacteroides fragilis Chromosomal Transfer Factor Resembling Multiple Bacteroides sp. Mobilizable Transposons.", JOUMAL OF BACTERIOLOGY., (200204), vol. 184, no. 7, pages 1895 - 1904, XP055260537 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.184.7.1895-1904.2002 | [A] - KIRKWOOD, D., "Nutrients: Practical Notes On Their Determination In Seawater.", BALTIC SEAC ENVIRONMENT PROCEEDINGS., (19931005), vol. 58, pages 23 - 47, XP055260539 | [A] - NAKAMURA, Y ET AL., "Complete Genome Structure Of The Thermophilic Cyanobacterium Thermosynechococcus Elongats BP-1.", DNA RESEARCH., (2002), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 123 - 130, XP055260541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/9.4.123 |