EP3077910 - METHODS AND APPARATUS TO OPTIMIZE PLATFORM SIMULATION RESOURCE CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALANI, Parth 3600 Juliette Lane Mail Stop SC12-612 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 02 /
TAMHANKAR, Mangesh 3600 Juliette Lane Mail Stop SC12-612 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 03 /
JAYARAMAN, Remya 3600 Juliette Lane Mail Stop SC12-612 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | Rummler, Felix, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/41] | Rummler, Felix, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13898887.8 | 02.12.2013 | [2016/41] | WO2013US72571 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015084297 | Date: | 11.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3077910 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3077910 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/34, G06F17/50 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
G06F11/3457 (EP,US);
G06F11/302 (EP,US);
G06F11/3024 (EP,US);
G06F11/3041 (EP,US);
G06F11/3409 (EP,US);
G06F11/3442 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | G06F11/22, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RESSOURCENVERBRAUCHSOPTIMIERUNG IN EINER PLATTFORMSIMULATION | [2016/41] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS TO OPTIMIZE PLATFORM SIMULATION RESOURCE CONSUMPTION | [2016/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR OPTIMISER LA CONSOMMATION DE RESSOURCES DE SIMULATION DE PLATEFORME | [2016/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/41] | 12.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2013 | AL | 11.07.2018 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | PT | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | IE | 02.12.2018 | LU | 02.12.2018 | MT | 02.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
MT | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
MT | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
MT | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
IE | 02.12.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0227565 (CADENCE DESIGN SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 4, lines 1-13 * * page 8, line 17 - page 10, line 13 *; | [X]US2008262822 (HARDWICK JONATHAN C [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0025] - [0033] - [0038] , [0039] * * paragraphs [0051] , [0068] , [0104] - [0109] *; | [A]WO2010045744 (6FUSION INTERNAT LTD, et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0007] , [0018]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2004510258 (CADENCE DESIGN SYSTEMS, INC.); | [A]US2004215440 (CROWELL DANIEL M [US]); | [A]WO2006093762 (COWARE INC [US], et al); | [A]US2009024381 (SAKAMOTO YOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [A]US2010325616 (SINGONAHALLI JAYARAM [US], et al) | by applicant | US2008262822 |