|
17.04.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
30.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.06.2014 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |