01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
27.09.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
19.04.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
11.05.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.05.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.07.2015 |
First examination report |
|
06.02.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
06.02.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
03.02.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.07.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
27.06.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |