17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
27.04.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
19.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.03.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
15.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.12.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
11.12.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] |
07.12.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.07.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
10.07.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |