EP2899099 - An active crash structure arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rydsmo, Erik Loo Hästhagen 805 SE-466 95 Sollebrunn / SE | 02 /
Hoiss, Franz Eichenstr.17 82347 Bernried / DE | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 14152870.3 | 28.01.2014 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899099 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2899099 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, F16B31/00 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
B62D21/155 (EP);
F16B31/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2015/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Aktive Unfallstrukturanordnung | [2015/31] | English: | An active crash structure arrangement | [2015/31] | French: | Agencement de structure d'impact actif | [2015/31] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 20.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2014 | AL | 21.06.2017 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | MK | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | RS | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | SM | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | GB | 28.01.2018 | IE | 28.01.2018 | LU | 28.01.2018 | MT | 28.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.01.2014 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CY | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
MK | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
MT | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 28.01.2014 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
MT | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
MT | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
MT | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
MT | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
IE | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 28.01.2018 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
SM | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
RS | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013125998 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 15 *; | [A]US2010032983 (KUSAKA KAORU [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055] * |