Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9225161 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2015 | B2 | US2014218833 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310046177 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103973277B | Global Dossier | 09.06.2017 | B | CN103973277 | 06.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201310046177 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2840440 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2022 | C | CA2840440 | 05.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310046177 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2763319 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | B1 | EP2763319 | 06.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310046177 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102014002343 | 19.10.2021 | B1 | BR102014002343 | 29.05.2018 | A8 | BR102014002343 | 03.11.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CN201310046177 | 05.02.2013 |