EP2799989 - Apparatus and method of parallel processing execution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Song, Joon Ho c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Do Hyung c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Shi Hwa c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97 Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14153640.9 | 03.02.2014 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | KR20130039740 | 11.04.2013 Original published format: KR 20130039740 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2799989 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2799989 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
G06F9/5066 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (KR);
G06F9/5027 (US);
G06F9/28 (KR);
G06F2209/5017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2014/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Parallelverarbeitungsdurchführung | [2014/45] | English: | Apparatus and method of parallel processing execution | [2014/45] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'exécution de traitement parallèle | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5758176 (AGARWAL RAMESH CHANDRA [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-13 * column 1, line 46 - line 55 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 8 * * column 4, line 56 - line 61 * * column 5, line 29 - line 43 * * column 6, line 28 - line 42 * * column 7, line 21 - line 44 * * column 8, line 12 - line 59 * * figure 6 * [I] 7,8,14,15; | [I]US5987178 (ANESKO ALEXANDER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 12 * * column 6, line 38 - line 49 *; | [I]WO2012082421 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] *; | [I]US2010242014 (ZHU XIAOHAN [US]) [I] 1,8,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007018979 (BUDAGAVI MADHUKAR [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * | [X] - PUJARA C ET AL, "VC-1 video decoder optimization on ARM Cortex-A8 with NEON", COMMUNICATIONS (NCC), 2010 NATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100129), ISBN 978-1-4244-6383-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031648181 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - BURSKY D, "PARALLELISM PUSHES DSP THROUGHPUT. ÖA PARALLEL-PROCESSING DSP IC TAKES AIM AT MULTIMEDIA, DELIVERING 2GOPS WITH FOUR 32-BIT DSP ENGINES PLUS A RISC CPU", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (19940321), vol. 42, no. 6, ISSN 0013-4872, XP000449358 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |