EP2913538 - Improved toggle type pin and clamping member for said pin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SARL François Inglese Z.I. De Chassende 43000 Le Puy en Velay / FR | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inglese, François Le Hivernoux Bas 43120 Monistrol sur Loire / FR | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 place de l'Hotel de Ville CS 70203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 Place de l'Hotel de Ville CS 70203 42005 Saint Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14156727.1 | 26.02.2014 | [2015/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913538 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/08, F16B37/02 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
F16B13/0808 (EP);
F16B37/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Perfektionierter, mit Kippmechanismus ausgestatter Bolzen und Feststellorgan hierfür | [2015/36] | English: | Improved toggle type pin and clamping member for said pin | [2015/36] | French: | Cheville à bascule perfectionnée et organe de serrage pour ladite cheville | [2015/36] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 10.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0725219 (CCL SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]FR2446405 (PLOMBELEC) [A] 1,6 * figures 10,11 *; | [A]GB544088 (ERIC RAYMOND ALFONSO) [A] 1,6 * figure - *; | [A]US2397238 (CARL BROSE LEONARD) [A] 6 * figure - *; | [A]US2383164 (RYDER CHARLES D) [A] 6 * figure - *; | [A]US2966083 (NORTH CHENEY) [A] 6 * figure - * |