Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014137662 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134034 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2015 | A3 | WO2014134034 | 04.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134031 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2015 | A3 | WO2014134031 | 04.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134027 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2014 | A3 | WO2014134027 | 04.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134023 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134018 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134016 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2014 | A3 | WO2014134016 | 04.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134013 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134012 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014134007 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2014 | A3 | WO2014134007 | 04.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022226013 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US202217592821 | 04.02.2022 | US201815982352 | 17.05.2018 | US201615074296 | 18.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017007347 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014249557 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9468438 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2016 | B2 | US2014246479 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9554794 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2017 | B2 | US2014246478 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9326767 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2016 | B2 | US2014246477 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9307986 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2016 | B2 | US2014246476 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014246475 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9358003 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2016 | B2 | US2014246474 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9398911 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2016 | B2 | US2014246473 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9782169 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2014246472 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9700309 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2017 | B2 | US2014246471 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11957345 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2024 | B2 | US2023270438 | 31.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816154143 | 08.10.2018 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201615274939 | 23.09.2016 | US202218084141 | 19.12.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11529138 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | B2 | US2019105043 | 11.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816154143 | 08.10.2018 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201615274939 | 23.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11246618 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2022 | B2 | US2018333155 | 22.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201815982352 | 17.05.2018 | US201615074296 | 18.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10575868 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2020 | B2 | US2016270780 | 22.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201615074296 | 18.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10285695 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2019 | B2 | US2017007255 | 12.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615274971 | 23.09.2016 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10226249 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B2 | US2017007254 | 12.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201615274939 | 23.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6518598B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2019 | B2 | JP2016513993 | 19.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18233 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6382235B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | B2 | JP2016512990 | 12.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18224 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6345707B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2018 | B2 | JP2016512058 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18304 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6339114B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B2 | JP2016512057 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18289 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6336492B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B2 | JP2016512056 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18282 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6316853B | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B2 | JP2016512055 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18271 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6325007B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2018 | B2 | JP2016512054 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18259 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6461826B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2019 | B2 | JP2016512053 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18253 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6333864B | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B2 | JP2016512052 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18241 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6444897B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2018 | B2 | JP2016512051 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18235 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3756585 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2021 | A3 | EP3756585 | 30.12.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | EP14157540 | 03.03.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3744262 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | EP14157539 | 03.03.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3685759 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2022 | B1 | EP3685759 | 29.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | EP14157526 | 03.03.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3449850 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | EP14157533 | 03.03.2014 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3308722 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | EP14157530 | 03.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772214 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B1 | EP2772214 | 03.12.2014 | A3 | EP2772214 | 03.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772211 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2020 | B1 | EP2772211 | 26.11.2014 | A3 | EP2772211 | 03.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772210 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2020 | B1 | EP2772210 | 08.04.2015 | A3 | EP2772210 | 03.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772209 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2018 | B1 | EP2772209 | 03.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772208 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772207 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2023 | C0 | EP2772207 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2023 | B1 | EP2772207 | 03.12.2014 | A3 | EP2772207 | 03.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772205 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2022 | B1 | EP2772205 | 03.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772204 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2019 | B1 | EP2772204 | 03.12.2014 | A3 | EP2772204 | 03.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772196 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | B1 | EP2772196 | 03.12.2014 | A3 | EP2772196 | 03.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105101887B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B | CN105101887 | 25.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18224 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105025826B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B | CN105025826 | 04.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18233 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105025821B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | B | CN105025821 | 04.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18241 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105025820B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2019 | B | CN105025820 | 04.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18304 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105025819B | Global Dossier | 14.08.2018 | B | CN105025819 | 04.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18253 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105025818B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2017 | B | CN105025818 | 04.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18271 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105025813B | Global Dossier | 26.01.2018 | B | CN105025813 | 04.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18282 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105007837 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18235 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105007836B | Global Dossier | 13.10.2017 | B | CN105007836 | 28.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18259 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105007835B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | B | CN105007835 | 28.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18289 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903233 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2021 | C | CA2903233 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18304 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903228 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2021 | C | CA2903228 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18289 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903223 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2021 | C | CA2903223 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18259 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903219 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | C | CA2903219 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18253 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903214 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2023 | C | CA2903214 | 12.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18241 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903211 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2021 | C | CA2903211 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18235 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903207 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2021 | C | CA2903207 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18233 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2903202 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2021 | C | CA2903202 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18224 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2902899 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2021 | C | CA2902899 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18282 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2902897 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2021 | C | CA2902897 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18271 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014226427B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2018 | B2 | AU2014226427 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18241 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223730B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2018 | B2 | AU2014223730 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18304 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223727B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2018 | B2 | AU2014223727 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18289 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223723B | Global Dossier | 15.02.2018 | B2 | AU2014223723 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18282 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223719B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2018 | B2 | AU2014223719 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18271 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223714B | Global Dossier | 26.10.2017 | B2 | AU2014223714 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18259 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223712B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2018 | B2 | AU2014223712 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18253 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223709B | Global Dossier | 22.02.2018 | B2 | AU2014223709 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18235 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223708B | Global Dossier | 15.02.2018 | B2 | AU2014223708 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18233 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014223703B | Global Dossier | 26.10.2017 | B2 | AU2014223703 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18224 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772206 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2017 | B8 | EP2772206 | 08.11.2017 | B1 | EP2772206 | 26.11.2014 | A3 | EP2772206 | 03.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021050 | 28.12.2021 | B1 | BR112015021050 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18271 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021075 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18259 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021082 | 10.05.2022 | B1 | BR112015021082 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18304 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021091 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18235 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021098 | 15.02.2022 | B1 | BR112015021098 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18224 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021113 | 12.04.2022 | B1 | BR112015021113 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18289 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021135 | 16.08.2022 | B1 | BR112015021135 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18241 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021141 | 28.12.2021 | B1 | BR112015021141 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18233 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021153 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18253 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021157 | 30.11.2021 | B1 | BR112015021157 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18282 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX368026 | 12.09.2019 | B | MX2015011327 | 03.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18224 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX366564 | 11.07.2019 | B | MX2015011329 | 06.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18233 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015011332 | 31.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18235 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX364728 | 06.05.2019 | B | MX2015011333 | 03.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18241 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX364301 | 22.04.2019 | B | MX2015011334 | 31.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18253 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX364302 | 22.04.2019 | B | MX2015011336 | 31.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18259 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX364299 | 22.04.2019 | B | MX2015011339 | 26.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18271 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX366354 | 05.07.2019 | B | MX2015011342 | 26.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18282 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015011343 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18289 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX364729 | 06.05.2019 | B | MX2015011345 | 26.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18304 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2772206T | 29.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | EP14157530 | 03.03.2014 | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2661144 | 11.07.2018 | C2 | RU2015141594 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18259 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782358 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2684177 | 04.04.2019 | C2 | RU2015141596 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782518 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18282 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2690595 | 04.06.2019 | C2 | RU2015141627 | 13.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782338 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18235 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2669463 | 11.10.2018 | C2 | RU2015141630 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18304 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782536 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2646575 | 05.03.2018 | C2 | RU2015141673 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782481 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18271 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2664168 | 15.08.2018 | C2 | RU2015141697 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18241 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782499 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2672520 | 15.11.2018 | C2 | RU2015141700 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782295 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18224 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2663713 | 08.08.2018 | C2 | RU2015141702 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US18289 | 25.02.2014 | US201313782375 | 01.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2650201 | 11.04.2018 | C2 | RU2015141704 | 01.03.2018 | A3 | RU2015141704 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782323 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18233 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2663487 | 06.08.2018 | C2 | RU2015141714 | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313782460 | 01.03.2013 | WO2014US18253 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Divisional application | EP3308722 |