EP2815995 - Insert inserter for flat articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BÖWE SYSTEC GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 1 86159 Augsburg / DE | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höpner, Bernd Alpenstraße 21 86159 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Celeste, Ronald Truchseßstr. 9 86707 Kühlenthal / DE | 03 /
Hölzle, Florian Oberschönenfelderstr. 9b 86199 Augsburg / DE | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstraße 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Charrier, Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14169513.0 | 22.05.2014 | [2014/52] | Priority number, date | DE201310106483 | 21.06.2013 Original published format: DE102013106483 | [2014/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815995 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2815995 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/62, B65H3/04, B65H3/66 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
B65H3/042 (EP,US);
B65H3/24 (US);
B65H3/62 (EP,US);
B65H3/66 (EP,US);
B65H2405/1122 (EP,US);
B65H2513/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | Beilagenanleger für flache Güter | [2014/52] | English: | Insert inserter for flat articles | [2014/52] | French: | Margeur de documents pour marchandises plates | [2014/52] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 27.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2014 | AL | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | HR | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MK | 15.07.2015 | MT | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | RS | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | SM | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | NO | 15.10.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1812960U (WARREN S D CO [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2096057 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP2407400 (EZAWA JIMUKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE1178444 | DE1263027 |